Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michel Christian Cartatéguy, S.M.A.

Archbishop Emeritus of Niamey, Niger


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1951 Born
27 May 197826.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Society of African Missions
1 Jul 197927.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
18 May 199947.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Niamey, Niger
18 May 199947.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Aulon
26 Sep 199947.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aulon
25 Jan 200351.2AppointedBishop of Niamey, Niger
2 Mar 200351.3InstalledBishop of Niamey, Niger
25 Jun 200755.6AppointedArchbishop of Niamey, Niger
11 Oct 201462.9ResignedArchbishop of Niamey, Niger

MicroData Summary for Michel Christian Cartatéguy
Archbishop Michel Christian Cartatéguy S.M.A. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Niamey

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHasparren, Diocese of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron), France
Ordained DeaconSainte-Jeanne d'Arc [Avenue Reille], Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopPalais des Sports, Niamey, Diocese of Niamey

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Niamey.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,623
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Oct 2014
  • od/c0/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 6 Jul 2018

Quantcast