Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Etienne-Joseph de Pavée de Villevieille

Deceased

Bishop of Bayonne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1739BornVillevieille
26 Oct 178343.8SelectedBishop of Bayonne, France
15 Dec 178343.9ConfirmedBishop of Bayonne, France
11 Jan 178444.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bayonne, France
Mar 1793³53.1DiedBishop of Bayonne, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Etienne-Joseph de Pavée de Villevieille:
Bishop Etienne-Joseph de Pavée de Villevieille (born , died Mar 1793) Bishop of Bayonne

  • a bishop for 9.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1784, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 113

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 3 Jan 2016