Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Jacques Loison

Deceased

Bishop of Bayonne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1744BornMontaubé
5 Jul 180258.3SelectedBishop of Bayonne, France
11 Nov 180258.7ConfirmedBishop of Bayonne, France
14 Nov 180258.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bayonne, France
17 Feb 182075.9DiedBishop of Bayonne, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Jacques Loison:
Bishop Joseph-Jacques Loison (born , died ) Bishop of Bayonne

  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 103
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015