Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guillaume Pierre Cardinal Godin, O.P. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1260¹BornBayonne
1279¹19.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
23 Dec 131252.9Elevated to Cardinal
23 Dec 131252.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
12 Sep 131757.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
4 Jun 133676.4DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Pierre Godin:
Guillaume Pierre Cardinal Godin O.P. (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

  • a cardinal for 23.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Dec 1312

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015