Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Héctor d’Ailly de Rochefort (Rupefort)

Deceased

Bishop of Toul, France


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Dec 1519AppointedBishop of Bayonne, France
20 May 1521Ordained BishopBishop of Bayonne, France
12 Feb 1524AppointedBishop of Toul, France
1 Mar 1532DiedBishop of Toul, France

MicroData Summary for Héctor d’Ailly de Rochefort (Rupefort)
Bishop Héctor d’Ailly de Rochefort (Rupefort) (died ) Bishop of Toul

EventPlace
Ordained BishopChapel of the Consecrator, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 321, and Page 127
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1521, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 8 Jun 2018

Quantcast