Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean Victor Émile Chesnelong

Deceased

Archbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1856Born
20 Sep 187923.4Ordained PriestPriest
21 Feb 190649.8AppointedBishop of Valence, France
25 Feb 190649.8Ordained BishopBishop of Valence, France
12 Jan 191255.7AppointedArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
19 Mar 191255.9InstalledArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
29 Nov 193175.6DiedArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France

MicroData Summary for Jean Victor Émile Chesnelong
Archbishop Jean Victor Émile Chesnelong (born , died ) Archbishop of Sens (-Auxerre)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrthez

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 21 Jul 2018

Quantcast