Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Prosper-Michel-Arnaud Hiraboure

Deceased

Bishop of Aire et Dax, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1805Born
13 Jun 182923.6Ordained PriestPriest of Bayonne, France
7 Oct 185651.0SelectedBishop of Aire, France
15 Dec 185651.1ConfirmedBishop of Aire, France
8 Mar 185751.4Ordained BishopBishop of Aire, France
6 Jun 185953.6DiedBishop of Aire et Dax, France

MicroData Summary for Prosper-Michel-Arnaud Hiraboure
Bishop Prosper-Michel-Arnaud Hiraboure (born , died ) Bishop of Aire et Dax

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBayonne, Diocese of Bayonne
Ordained BishopCathedral, Auch, Archdiocese of Auch

  • a priest for 29.9 years
  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 130
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast