Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Yves Marie Sahuquet

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tarbes et Lourdes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1923BornNimes
29 Jun 194824.6Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 197855.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron), France
11 Dec 197855.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Utica
25 Feb 197955.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Utica
15 May 198561.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Tarbes et Lourdes, France
25 Mar 198864.4SucceededBishop of Tarbes et Lourdes, France
16 Jan 199874.2RetiredBishop of Tarbes et Lourdes, France
7 Dec 200683.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Tarbes et Lourdes, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Yves Marie Sahuquet:
Bishop Jean Yves Marie Sahuquet (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tarbes et Lourdes

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013