Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Saint-Pierre

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Carthage

Titular Bishop of Gordus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1884BornVillefranque, France
13 Sep 190824.3Ordained PriestPriest
28 May 193046.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Carthage, Tunisia
28 May 193046.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Gordus
15 Jul 193046.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gordus
Aug 1937³53.2ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Carthage, Tunisia
18 Dec 195167.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Carthage, Tunisia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Saint-Pierre:
Bishop Jean Saint-Pierre (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Carthage

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013