Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel de La Roque-Prielé

Deceased

Bishop of Bayonne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1623¹BornTarbes
30 May 168158.4SelectedBishop of Bayonne, France
22 Sep 168158.7ConfirmedBishop of Bayonne, France
23 May 168259.3InstalledBishop of Bayonne, France
19 Jun 168865.4DiedBishop of Bayonne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel de La Roque-Prielé:
Bishop Gabriel de La Roque-Prielé (born 1623, died ) Bishop of Bayonne

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 112
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1681, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 20 Apr 2015