Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Dominic Desperben, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Prefect of Hainan [Hainan]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1898BornBéguios, France
192021.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
2 Aug 192527.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
24 Mar 193940.6AppointedPrefect of Hainan [Hainan], China
16 Jun 198081.9DiedPrefect of Hainan [Hainan], China

MicroData Summary for Dominic Desperben:
Father Dominic Desperben SS.CC. (born , died ) Prefect of Hainan [Hainan]

  • a priest for 54.8 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015