Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Étienne Poncher

Deceased

Archbishop of Tours, France


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Sep 1532AppointedBishop of Bayonne, France
6 Apr 1551AppointedArchbishop of Tours, France
15 Mar 1553DiedArchbishop of Tours, France

MicroData Summary for Étienne Poncher
Archbishop Étienne Poncher (died ) Archbishop of Tours

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 128, and Page 321

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast