Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Aire et Dax

Dioecesis Aturensis et Aquae Augustae



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 3 June 1857
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bordeaux (-Bazas)
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 9,364 (3,616 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sud-Ouest
  • Official Web Site: https://landes.catholique.fr/
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 224, 40105 Dax CEDEX; 100 avenue Francis Plante, 40100 Dax, France
  • Telephone: 5.58.56.59.90
  • Fax: 5.58.56.59.93

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Aire
5th CenturyErectedDiocese of Aire (erected)
29 November 1801SuppressedDiocese of Aire (suppressed) Diocese of Bayonne
Archdiocese of Bordeaux
Diocese of Aire
6 October 1822RestoredDiocese of Bayonne Diocese of Aire
Diocese of Tarbes
Diocese of Aire et Dax
3 June 1857Name ChangedDiocese of Aire Diocese of Aire et Dax
8 December 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Aire et Dax (from Auch)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Aire et Dax
1948240,000251,43695.5%35440394609324ap1951
1958238,000248,94395.6%377237962750420322ap1960
1970250,000277,38190.1%3262635271038292326ap1971
1980252,300301,80083.6%2753931480353447345ap1981
1990260,000312,00083.3%24737284915371328351ap1991
1999255,000311,45881.9%199342331,09444616936ap2000
2000255,000326,90078.0%184342181,16934515236ap2001
2001255,000326,61778.1%170352051,24364026936ap2002
2002255,000326,61778.1%166352011,26874426435ap2003
2003255,000326,61778.1%165291941,31473925935ap2004
2004255,000326,61778.1%154311851,37874216835ap2005
2006256,700329,30078.0%158261841,39593418435ap2007
2012264,000377,38170.0%133201531,725133016235ap2013
2015274,000387,81770.7%97151122,446192913735ap2016

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_d, v3.2.2, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 May 2018

Quantcast