Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François-Xavier-Marie-Jules Gieure

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron)

Titular Archbishop of Cius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1851BornCastets-lès-Landes
30 May 187423.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 Feb 190654.8AppointedBishop of Bayonne, France
25 Feb 190654.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bayonne, France
20 Mar 190654.9InstalledBishop of Bayonne, France
31 Jan 193482.7RetiredBishop of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron), France
31 Jan 193482.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cius
23 Apr 193786.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron), France

MicroData Summary for François-Xavier-Marie-Jules Gieure:
Archbishop François-Xavier-Marie-Jules Gieure (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron)

  • a priest for 62.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 77
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013