Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Jean Houbaut

Deceased

Bishop of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1880BornVitrey
10 Jul 190424.3Ordained PriestPriest
24 Dec 193454.8AppointedBishop of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron), France
14 Feb 193554.9Ordained BishopBishop of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron), France
28 Feb 193554.9InstalledBishop of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron), France
17 Jul 193959.3DiedBishop of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron), France

MicroData Summary for Henri-Jean Houbaut:
Bishop Henri-Jean Houbaut (born , died ) Bishop of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron)

  • a priest for 35.0 years
  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013