Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Joseph-Marie-Eugène de Jerphanion

Deceased

Archbishop of Albi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1796BornLe Puy-en-Velay
1 Jun 182226.2Ordained PriestPriest
22 May 183539.2SelectedBishop of Saint-Dié, France
24 Jul 183539.4ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Dié, France
6 Sep 183539.5Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Dié, France
27 Jul 184246.4SelectedArchbishop of Albi, France
27 Jan 184346.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Albi, France
9 Mar 184347.0InstalledArchbishop of Albi, France
20 Nov 186468.7DiedArchbishop of Albi, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Joseph-Marie-Eugène de Jerphanion:
Archbishop Jean-Joseph-Marie-Eugène de Jerphanion (born , died ) Archbishop of Albi

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 65, and Page 174

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013