Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Adrien Cardinal Gouffier de Boissy

Deceased

Administrator of Albi, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1479Born
15 Apr 151031.2AppointedBishop of Coutances, France
2 Jun 151031.4Ordained BishopBishop of Coutances, France
14 Dec 151536.9Elevated to Cardinal
14 Dec 151536.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
151738.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
6 Jun 151940.4AppointedAdministrator of Albi, France
9 Nov 152041.8ResignedCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
24 Jul 152344.5DiedAdministrator of Albi, France

MicroData Summary for Adrien Gouffier de Boissy
Adrien Cardinal Gouffier de Boissy (born 1479, died ) Administrator of Albi

  • a bishop for 13.1 years
  • a cardinal for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Dec 1515
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 176
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1510, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 15 May 2018

Quantcast