Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Joseph-Aimé Moussaron

Deceased

Archbishop of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1877BornTournecoupe
14 Jul 190123.8Ordained PriestPriest
9 Oct 192952.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez), France
9 Oct 192952.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamia
6 Jan 193052.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamia
20 Aug 193658.9AppointedBishop of Cahors, France
11 May 194062.6AppointedArchbishop of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur), France
10 Mar 195678.4DiedArchbishop of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Joseph-Aimé Moussaron:
Archbishop Jean-Joseph-Aimé Moussaron (born , died ) Archbishop of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur)

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015