Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hyacinthe Serroni, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Albi, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1617Born
27 May 164729.7AppointedBishop of Orange, France
2 Jun 164729.7Ordained BishopBishop of Orange, France
28 Feb 166143.4SelectedBishop of Mende, France
8 Aug 166143.9ConfirmedBishop of Mende, France
26 Aug 167658.9SelectedBishop of Albi, France
11 Oct 167760.1ResignedBishop of Mende, France
3 Oct 167861.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Albi, France
22 Feb 167961.4InstalledArchbishop of Albi, France
7 Jan 168769.3DiedArchbishop of Albi, France

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Hyacinthe Serroni (VIAF: 49367673)
Archbishop Hyacinthe Serroni O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Albi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 39.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 75
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 102, and Page 242
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1647, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast