Catholic-Hierarchy DC

François-Joachim Cardinal de Pierre de Bernis

Deceased

Archbishop of Albi

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1715BornSaint-Marcel-d'Ardèche
2 Oct 175843.4Elevated to Cardinal
27 May 176449.0SelectedArchbishop of Albi, France
9 Jul 176449.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Albi, France
5 Aug 176449.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Albi, France
26 Jun 176954.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
18 Apr 177458.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
2 Nov 179479.4DiedArchbishop of Albi, France

MicroData Summary for François-Joachim de Pierre de Bernis:
Cardinal François-Joachim de Pierre de Bernis (born , died ) Archbishop of Albi

  • a bishop for 30.2 years
  • a cardinal for 36.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b/c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Oct 1758
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Sep 2013