Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel Pierre Marie Mouïsse

Bishop Emeritus of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1939 Born
18 Dec 196627.1Ordained PriestPriest of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur), France
10 Mar 200060.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Grenoble, France
10 Mar 200060.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Lambaesis
7 May 200060.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lambaesis
5 Mar 200464.3AppointedBishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France
2 May 200464.5InstalledBishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France
18 Jun 201474.6RetiredBishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France

MicroData Summary for Michel Pierre Marie Mouïsse
Bishop Michel Pierre Marie Mouïsse (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Périgueux (-Sarlat)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMazamet

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Périgueux (-Sarlat).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,760
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Jun 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast