Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre-Marie Joseph Carré

Archbishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1947 BornSerques
7 Sep 197427.4Ordained PriestPriest of Agen, France
13 Jul 200053.2AppointedArchbishop of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur), France
8 Oct 200053.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur), France
14 May 201063.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France
3 Jun 201164.1SucceededArchbishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Marie Joseph Carré:
Archbishop Pierre-Marie Joseph Carré (born ) Archbishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 May 2010
  • s: Bollettino, 3 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 161, Number 13,851

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013