Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guillaume Cardinal Court, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Apr 1337AppointedBishop of Nīmes, France
3 Dec 1337AppointedBishop of Albi, France
18 Dec 1338AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
18 Dec 1338Elevated to Cardinal
18 Dec 1350AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
12 Jun 1361DiedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Court:
Cardinal Guillaume Court O. Cist. (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

  • a cardinal for 22.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1338

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013