Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Le Puy-en-Velay

Dioecesis Aniciensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Restored: 6 October 1822
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Clermont
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 5,001 (1,931 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Centre-Est
  • Official Web Site: http://catholique-lepuy.cef.fr/
  • Mailing Address: 2 Place du For, 43000 Le Puy-en-Velay, France
  • Telephone: 4.71.05.54.69
  • Fax: 4.71.05.87.92

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Le Puy-en-Velay
3rd CenturyErectedDiocese of Le Puy-en-Velay (erected)
29 November 1801SuppressedDiocese of Le Puy-en-Velay (suppressed) Diocese of Clermont
Diocese of Le Puy-en-Velay
6 October 1822RestoredDiocese of Saint-Flour Diocese of Le Puy-en-Velay
8 December 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Le Puy-en-Velay (from Bourges)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Le Puy-en-Velay
1950220,000228,07696.5%457264834553701,571280ap1951
1970201,735208,33796.8%40294114901861,325277ap1971
1980199,000207,70095.8%357103675421591,111279ap1981
1990201,000210,00095.7%28562916903110894284ap1991
1999190,000206,00092.2%20892178757101686282ap2000
2000190,000209,11390.9%2029211900893661282ap2001
2001190,000209,04790.9%1949203935994650284ap2002
2002190,000209,04790.9%1969205926993620284ap2003
2003189,000208,00090.9%18810198954894574284ap2004
2004190,000209,04790.9%1829191994884553284ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 19 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014