Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Cardinal Jouffroy, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Albi

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1412¹BornLuxeuil
30 Apr 145341.3AppointedBishop of Arras, France
18 Dec 146150.0Elevated to Cardinal
13 Mar 146250.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
10 Dec 146250.9AppointedBishop of Albi, France
24 Nov 147361.9DiedBishop of Albi, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Jouffroy:
Cardinal Jean Jouffroy O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Albi

  • a cardinal for 11.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1461

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013