Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Robert-Joseph Cardinal Coffy

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Marseille

Cardinal-Priest of San Luigi Maria Grignion de Montfort


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1920BornLe Biot
28 Oct 194424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Annecy, France
11 Feb 196746.3AppointedBishop of Gap, France
23 Apr 196746.5Ordained BishopBishop of Gap, France
15 Jun 197453.6AppointedArchbishop of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur), France
13 Apr 198564.5AppointedArchbishop of Marseille, France
28 Jun 199170.7Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 199170.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Luigi Maria Grignion de Montfort
22 Apr 199574.5RetiredArchbishop of Marseille, France
15 Jul 199574.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Marseille, France

MicroData Summary for Robert-Joseph Coffy:
Robert-Joseph Cardinal Coffy (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Marseille

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
  • a cardinal for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Mar 2014