Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Auguste-Emile Caraguel

Deceased

Bishop of Perpignan-Elne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1821BornLabruguière
20 Dec 184524.3Ordained PriestPriest of Albi, France
25 Jul 187755.9SelectedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
21 Sep 187756.1ConfirmedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
25 Nov 187756.3Ordained BishopBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
23 Jul 188563.9DiedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Auguste-Emile Caraguel:
Bishop Jean-Auguste-Emile Caraguel (born , died ) Bishop of Perpignan-Elne

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 258

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013