Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilles-Henri-Alexis Barthe

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fréjus-Toulon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1906Born
29 Jun 193024.0Ordained PriestPriest of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur), France
13 May 195346.9AppointedBishop of Monaco
24 Jun 195347.0Ordained BishopBishop of Monaco
4 May 196255.9AppointedBishop of Fréjus-Toulon, France
8 Feb 198376.6RetiredBishop of Fréjus-Toulon, France
14 Jul 199387.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Fréjus-Toulon, France

MicroData Summary for Gilles-Henri-Alexis Barthe
Bishop Gilles-Henri-Alexis Barthe (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fréjus-Toulon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBriatexte

  • a priest for 63.0 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast