Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François de Pierre de Bernis

Deceased

Archbishop of Rouen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1752BornNimes
29 Mar 177724.3Ordained PriestPriest
10 Dec 178129.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Albi, France
10 Dec 178129.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Apollonia
30 Dec 178129.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Apollonia
11 Jul 178431.6SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Albi, France
20 Sep 178431.8ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Albi, France
20 Sep 178431.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Damascus
2 Nov 179441.9SucceededArchbishop of Albi, France
2 Mar 180249.3ResignedArchbishop of Albi, France
31 Jul 181966.7SelectedArchbishop of Rouen, France
27 Sep 181966.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Rouen, France
27 Nov 181967.0InstalledArchbishop of Rouen, France
4 Feb 182370.2DiedArchbishop of Rouen, France

MicroData Summary for François de Pierre de Bernis:
Archbishop François de Pierre de Bernis (born , died ) Archbishop of Rouen

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 41.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 73, and Page 90
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 192
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 326

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Sep 2013