Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Louis Marie Balsa

Bishop of Viviers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1957 BornNice
9 Sep 198427.4Ordained PriestPriest of Nice, France
22 May 201558.1AppointedBishop of Viviers, France
12 Sep 201558.4Ordained BishopBishop of Viviers, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Louis Marie Balsa:
Bishop Jean-Louis Marie Balsa (born ) Bishop of Viviers

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Viviers.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 May 2015
  • ob: CB, 22 May 2015
  • mn: CB, 5 Jun 2015
  • c2: CB, 24 Aug 2015
  • c34: CB, 30 Aug 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,574

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015