Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe Rodolfi

Deceased

Bishop of Albi, France


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Feb 1568AppointedBishop of Albi, France
2 Nov 1569Ordained BishopBishop of Albi, France
30 Jun 1574DiedBishop of Albi, France

MicroData Summary for Philippe Rodolfi
Bishop Philippe Rodolfi (died ) Bishop of Albi

EventPlace
Ordained BishopFranciscan, Church, Albi, Diocese of Albi

  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 101
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1569, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast