Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Louis Cardinal d’Amboise (II)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Albi, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1479¹Born
1 Jul 150324.5AppointedBishop of Albi, France
18 Dec 150627.9Elevated to Cardinal
11 Jan 151031.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
30 Sep 151031.7ResignedBishop of Albi, France
3 Mar 151132.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Albi, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis d’Amboise (II)
Louis Cardinal d’Amboise (II) (born 1479, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Albi

EventPlace
Death PlaceLoreto

  • a cardinal for 4.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1506
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1503, Number 20*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 84
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 101

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast