Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre-Célestin Cézerac

Deceased

Archbishop of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1856BornCaussens
18 Dec 188024.6Ordained PriestPriest of Auch, France
27 Nov 191155.6AppointedBishop of Cahors, France
4 Jan 191255.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cahors, France
2 Jan 191861.7AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Albi, France
2 Jan 191861.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Mauretania
18 Mar 191861.9SucceededArchbishop of Albi, France
30 Jan 194083.7DiedArchbishop of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur), France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Célestin Cézerac:
Archbishop Pierre-Célestin Cézerac (born , died ) Archbishop of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur)

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 44, and Page 99

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013