Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eudoxe-Irénée-Edouard Mignot

Deceased

Archbishop of Albi, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1842Born
23 Sep 186523.0Ordained PriestPriest of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
3 Jun 189047.7SelectedBishop of Fréjus, France
26 Jun 189047.7ConfirmedBishop of Fréjus, France
31 Aug 189047.9Ordained BishopBishop of Fréjus, France
18 Sep 189047.9InstalledBishop of Fréjus, France
7 Dec 189957.2SelectedArchbishop of Albi, France
14 Dec 189957.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Albi, France
18 Mar 191875.4DiedArchbishop of Albi, France

MicroData Summary for Eudoxe-Irénée-Edouard Mignot (VIAF: 76444520)
Archbishop Eudoxe-Irénée-Edouard Mignot (born , died ) Archbishop of Albi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrancourt-le-Grand, Diocese of Soissons (-Laon)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Soissons, Diocese of Soissons (-Laon)

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 86, and Page 274
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017