Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuliano de’ Medici

Deceased

Bishop of Albi, France


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Apr 1561AppointedBishop of Béziers, France
1 May 1567Ordained BishopBishop of Béziers, France
29 May 1574AppointedArchbishop of Aix, France
1575²ResignedArchbishop of Aix, France
28 Mar 1576AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Albi, France
28 Jul 1588DiedBishop of Albi, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuliano de’ Medici
Archbishop Giuliano de’ Medici (died ) Bishop of Albi

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 135, and Page 113
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 101
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 11, Number 25
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1567, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 2 Jul 2018

Quantcast