Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bernard Cardinal de Castanet

Deceased

Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1240¹Born
7 Mar 127535.1AppointedBishop of Albi, France
30 Jul 130868.5AppointedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
17 Dec 131676.9Elevated to Cardinal
17 Dec 131676.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
14 Aug 131777.6DiedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernard de Castanet (VIAF: 309815233)
Bernard Cardinal de Castanet (born 1240, died ) Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontpellier, Diocese of Maguelonne
Death PlaceAvignon, Diocese of Avignon
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Avignon, Diocese of Avignon

  • a cardinal for .6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 81, and Page 91
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Dec 1316

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018