Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alphonse d’Elbène

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Albi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580¹Born
4 Feb 160828.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Albi, France
4 Feb 160828.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Auzia
8 Feb 160828.1SucceededBishop of Albi, France
30 Mar 160828.2Ordained BishopBishop of Albi, France
Oct 1634²54.7ResignedBishop of Albi, France
5 Jan 165171.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Albi, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alphonse d’Elbène:
Bishop Alphonse d’Elbène (born 1580, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Albi

  • a bishop for 42.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 75, and Page 103
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,374
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1608, Number 33
  • b/c2+: ATh, 21 Nov 2015
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,593

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 5 Jan 2016