Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles Le Goux de la Berchère

Deceased

Archbishop of Narbonne, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1647²Born
18 Jun 167730.4SelectedBishop of Lavaur, France
11 Oct 167730.7ConfirmedBishop of Lavaur, France
12 Apr 167831.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lavaur, France
18 Oct 167831.7InstalledBishop of Lavaur, France
13 Nov 168538.8AppointedArchbishop of Aix, France
18 Jan 168740.0SelectedArchbishop of Albi, France
12 Oct 169346.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Albi, France
15 Aug 170356.6SelectedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
12 Nov 170356.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
2 Jun 171972.4DiedArchbishop of Narbonne, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles Le Goux de la Berchère
Archbishop Charles Le Goux de la Berchère (born 1647, died ) Archbishop of Narbonne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBourgogne

  • a bishop for 41.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 75, and Page 280
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 406
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1678, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast