Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Louis Cardinal de Guise de Lorraine

Deceased

Bishop of Metz, France

Cardinal-Priest of San Tommaso in Parione


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1527Born
11 May 154517.5AppointedBishop of Troyes, France
27 Jun 155022.6AppointedBishop of Albi, France
22 Dec 155326.1Elevated to Cardinal
17 Jul 155527.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Tommaso in Parione
9 May 156133.5ResignedBishop of Albi, France
9 May 156133.5AppointedArchbishop of Sens, France
16 Dec 156235.1ResignedArchbishop of Sens, France
24 Mar 156840.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Tommaso in Parione
5 Oct 156840.9AppointedBishop of Metz, France
1 Apr 157143.4Ordained BishopBishop of Metz, France
29 Mar 157850.4DiedBishop of Metz, France

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Louis de Guise de Lorraine (VIAF: 86139333)
Louis Cardinal de Guise de Lorraine (born , died ) Bishop of Metz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastle of Joinville
Ordained BishopInfirmary, Saint Victor, Abbey, Paris, Diocese of Paris
Death PlaceParis, Diocese of Paris
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Victor, Abbey, Paris, Diocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 6.9 years
  • a cardinal for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Dec 1553
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 298, and Page 317
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1545
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1571, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018