Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Robert Cardinal Guibé

Deceased

Administrator of Vannes, France

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia

Administrator of Albi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1460Born
16 May 148323.3AppointedBishop of Tréguier, France
24 Mar 150242.2AppointedBishop of Rennes, France
1 Dec 150545.9Elevated to Cardinal
17 Dec 150545.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
24 Jan 150747.0AppointedBishop of Nantes, France
30 Sep 151050.7AppointedAdministrator of Albi, France
17 Mar 151151.2AppointedAdministrator of Vannes, France
30 May 151151.4ResignedBishop of Nantes, France
4 Oct 151151.7AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
Dec 151151.9ResignedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
9 Nov 151353.8DiedAdministrator of Vannes, France

MicroData Summary for Robert Guibé
Robert Cardinal Guibé (born 1460, died ) Administrator of Vannes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVitrè

  • a cardinal for 7.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Dec 1505
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 283, and Page 101
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 254, and Page 222

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 2 Jul 2018

Quantcast