Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Józef Cardinal Glemp

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Warszawa {Warsaw}

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1929BornInowroclaw
25 May 195626.4Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno, Poland
4 Mar 197949.2AppointedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
21 Apr 197949.3Ordained BishopBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
29 Apr 197949.4InstalledBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
7 Jul 198151.6AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
7 Jul 198151.6AppointedArchbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
13 Sep 198151.7InstalledArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
18 Sep 198151.8AppointedOrdinary of Poland, Faithful of Eastern Rites
25 Sep 198151.8InstalledArchbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
2 Feb 198353.1Elevated to Cardinal
2 Feb 198353.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
13 Mar 198353.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
25 Mar 199262.3ResignedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
6 Dec 200677.0RetiredArchbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
6 Jan 200777.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
3 Mar 200777.2ResignedApostolic Administrator of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
9 Jun 200777.5RetiredOrdinary of Poland, Faithful of Eastern Rites
23 Jan 201383.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Józef Glemp:
Józef Cardinal Glemp (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Warszawa {Warsaw}

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 33.8 years
  • a cardinal for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Dec 2006
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Jun 2007
  • ob/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130
  • d: CB, 23 Jan 2013
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 15 Nov 2014