Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henryk Józef Muszyński

Archbishop Emeritus of Gniezno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1933 BornKoscierzyna
28 Apr 195724.1Ordained PriestPriest of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
23 Feb 198551.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
23 Feb 198551.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Villa Regis
25 Mar 198552.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Villa Regis
19 Dec 198754.7AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
25 Mar 199259.0AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
8 May 201077.1RetiredArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Henryk Józef Muszyński:
Archbishop Henryk Józef Muszyński (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Gniezno

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Gniezno.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 8 May 2010
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Apr 2014