Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Kasper Kazimierz Kolumna Cieciszowski

Deceased

Archbishop of Mohilev


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1745³BornLivena
18 Feb 176924.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
11 Mar 176924.1Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 177530.1SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
29 May 177530.3ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
29 May 177530.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Theveste
8 Oct 177530.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Theveste
7 Aug 178439.5SucceededBishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
17 Nov 179853.8AppointedBishop of Lutsk and Zhytomyr (Łuck and Zytomierz), Ukraine
23 Jun 182883.4AppointedArchbishop of Mohilev, Belarus
28 Apr 183186.2DiedArchbishop of Mohilev, Belarus

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Kasper Kazimierz Kolumna Cieciszowski
Archbishop Kasper Kazimierz Kolumna Cieciszowski (born , died ) Archbishop of Mohilev

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 55.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 249, and Page 267
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 395
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 268
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016