Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Władysław Aleksander Łubieński

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1703³Born
1 Dec 175754.0SelectedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
13 Mar 175854.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
7 May 175854.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
9 Apr 175955.4AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
20 Jun 176763.6DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Władysław Aleksander Łubieński
Archbishop Władysław Aleksander Łubieński (born , died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIwanovicz

  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1758, Number 10
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 226, and Page 259

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast