Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Grzegorz Kaszak

Bishop of Sosnowiec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1964 BornChoszczno
18 Jun 198925.3Ordained PriestPriest of Szczecin-Kamień, Poland
10 Nov 200743.7AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for the Family
4 Feb 200944.9AppointedBishop of Sosnowiec, Poland
28 Mar 200945.1Ordained BishopBishop of Sosnowiec, Poland

MicroData Summary for Grzegorz Kaszak:
Bishop Grzegorz Kaszak (born ) Bishop of Sosnowiec

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sosnowiec.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,084
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013