Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michal Piwnicki

Deceased

Bishop of Lutsk and Zhytomyr (Łuck and Zytomierz)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1771³BornNiesuchojeże
3 Nov 179524.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
5 Nov 179524.1Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 182654.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lutsk and Zhytomyr (Łuck and Zytomierz), Ukraine
3 Jul 182654.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Ramata (Rama)
6 May 182755.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ramata (Rama)
23 Jun 182856.7SucceededBishop of Lutsk and Zhytomyr (Łuck and Zytomierz), Ukraine
29 May 184573.7DiedBishop of Lutsk and Zhytomyr (Łuck and Zytomierz), Ukraine

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michal Piwnicki:
Bishop Michal Piwnicki (born , died ) Bishop of Lutsk and Zhytomyr (Łuck and Zytomierz)

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 244, and Page 317

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013