Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Adam Ignacy Komorowski

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1699BornTrzeszozanica
3 Sep 172425.3Ordained PriestPriest
22 Sep 174950.3AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
28 Oct 174950.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
2 Mar 175959.8DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Adam Ignacy Komorowski:
Archbishop Adam Ignacy Komorowski (born , died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,862

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 27 Sep 2014