Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marian Kazimierz Zimałek

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sandomierz, Poland

Titular Bishop of Isola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1931Born
29 May 195524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Sandomierz-Radom, Poland
29 Apr 198755.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sandomierz-Radom, Poland
29 Apr 198755.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Isola
8 May 198755.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Isola
29 Dec 200776.6RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Sandomierz, Poland
12 Nov 200877.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sandomierz, Poland

MicroData Summary for Marian Kazimierz Zimałek
Bishop Marian Kazimierz Zimałek (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sandomierz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaków

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Dec 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,252
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast