Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jerzy Józef Elizeusz Szembek

Deceased

Archbishop of Mohilev

Apostolic Administrator of Minsk


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1851BornUjście
19 Mar 189342.2Ordained PriestPriest
15 Apr 190150.3AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
30 Jun 190150.5Ordained BishopBishop of Płock, Poland
9 Nov 190352.9AppointedArchbishop of Mohilev, Belarus
9 Nov 190352.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Minsk, Belarus
7 Aug 190554.6DiedArchbishop of Mohilev, Belarus

MicroData Summary for Jerzy Józef Elizeusz Szembek:
Archbishop Jerzy Józef Elizeusz Szembek (born , died ) Archbishop of Mohilev

  • a priest for 12.4 years
  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 460
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013