Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tadeusz Gocłowski, C.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Gdańsk, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1931Born
26 Jun 195624.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
22 Mar 198351.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gdańsk, Poland
22 Mar 198351.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Beneventum
17 Apr 198351.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Beneventum
31 Dec 198453.2AppointedBishop of Gdańsk, Poland
25 Mar 199260.5AppointedArchbishop of Gdańsk, Poland
17 Apr 200876.5RetiredArchbishop of Gdańsk, Poland
3 May 201684.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Gdańsk, Poland

MicroData Summary for Tadeusz Gocłowski (VIAF: 70796459)
Archbishop Tadeusz Gocłowski C.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Gdańsk

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiski

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Apr 2008
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 3 May 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Aug 2017